skip to content

Maccallum, Eoin David

CPSO#: 27785

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.D. Maccallum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS P O Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Phone:705-560-8461 Phone:877-560-4637 Fax: 75-524-8012 www.odstorage.com E-mail: [email protected]
Date Received: 31 May 2020


Address: ODS P O Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Phone:705-560-8461 Phone:877-560-4637 Fax: 75-524-8012 www.odstorage.com E-mail: [email protected]
Date Received: 11 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020