skip to content

Macaluso, Steven

CPSO#: 86548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4000 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Steven Macaluso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Macaluso ( CPSO# 86548 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN MACALUSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACALUSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012