skip to content

Macadam, Christine Mary

CPSO#: 31476

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. MacAdam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2020