skip to content

MacPhail, Janet Elspeth

CPSO#: 32059

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jan 1995

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 113 - 688 Fairchild Rd. Vancouver, BC V5Z 4P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020