skip to content

MacNeil, Stephanie Danielle

CPSO#: 92649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8767
Fax: (519) 685-8567 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Danielle MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DANIELLE MACNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 23 Apr 2010
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012