skip to content

MacNeil, John Roderick Grant

CPSO#: 97794

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: JRG MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Records for the period July 2014 to August 2018 Weeneebayko Health Authority 19 Hospital Drive PO Box 664 Moose Factory, ON P0L 1W0 Phone#: 705-658-4544 Records for the period September 2018 to November 2020 South East Grey Community Health Centre 55 Victoria Ave Markdale ON N0C 1H0
Date Received: 07 May 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Apr 2021