skip to content

MacLeod, Olivia Mary Jane

CPSO#: 90601

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O Mental Health Outpatients
9 - 1661 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9B7
Phone: (613) 738-6990
Fax: (613) 738-4891 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Youth Program
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: 613-722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Olivia MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. MacLeod ( CPSO# 90601 )

Business Address:
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
9-1661 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9B7
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLIVIA MARY JANE MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014