skip to content

MacLeod, Heather Carleen

CPSO#: 87260

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 947-0111
Fax: (519) 653-6555 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Heather MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. MacLeod ( CPSO# 87260 )

Business Address:
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 947-0111

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER CARLEEN MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012