skip to content

MacLean, David Alexander

CPSO#: 90330

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
EL - Cardiology

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 19 Oct 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2011