skip to content

MacKenzie, Robert Glen

CPSO#: 33035

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert G. MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jan 2013