skip to content

MacKenzie, Heather Margaret

CPSO#: 95611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Arthur J. Hobbins Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4080
Fax: 519-685-4081 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Heather M. MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. MacKenzie ( CPSO# 95611 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine & Rehab
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER MARGARET MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016