skip to content

MacFadden, Derek Robert

CPSO#: 93083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - CPC 214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10297
Fax: (613) 761-5260 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. R. MacFadden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. MacFadden ( CPSO# 93083 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
CPC 214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEREK ROBERT MACFADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACFADDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014