skip to content

MacDougall, Ian Alexander

CPSO#: 86583

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Feb 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IAN ALEXANDER MACDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)