skip to content

MacDonald, Matthew James

CPSO#: 90509

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro Street
Upper Level
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 508-5063
Fax: (519) 271-5930 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacDonald ( CPSO# 90509 )

Business Address:
Upper Level
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 508-5063

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011