skip to content

MacDonald, Lorraine Ann

CPSO#: 91120

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Hiil Side Drive
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone: 705-368-2182
Fax: 705-368-2229 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

48 Hillside Drive
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: 705-368-2182
Fax: 705-368-2229
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORRAINE ANN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011