skip to content

MacDonald, Blair Dickie Huxter

CPSO#: 91658

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 27 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2017