skip to content

MacDonald, Ashley Jennifer

CPSO#: 97872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
480 Huronia Road Suite 202
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-722-0516
Fax: 705-722-0814 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

370 Bayview Dr
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Canada
Phone: 705-721-0370 Ext. 4
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashley J. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. MacDonald ( CPSO# 97872 )

Business Address:
Unit 202
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4M 2A9
Phone Number: (705) 722-0516

Business Address:
Suite 304
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Business Address:
RVH
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASHLEY JENNIFER MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014