skip to content

MacDonald, Anthony George

CPSO#: 97901

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
179 Old Highway 17
PO Box 305
Plantagenet ON  K0B 1L0
Phone: (613) 673-4318
Fax: (613) 673-4480 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY GEORGE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014