skip to content

MacDonald, Angus Laurie

CPSO#: 26012

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015