skip to content

Mac Con, Kieran Sylvester

CPSO#: 29431

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 2018