skip to content

Mabifa, ola Lawal

CPSO#: 96756

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 4217
Fax: (519) 749-4271 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

850 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E8
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 4217
Fax: (519) 749-4271
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Mabifa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. o. Mabifa ( CPSO# 96756 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835/850 King Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 635-7862


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLA LAWAL MABIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MABIFA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2012