skip to content

Maarse, Miriam Jennifer

CPSO#: 93068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Burns, Miriam Jennifer (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 4412 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Maarse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maarse ( CPSO# 93068 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
CHEO
395 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRIAM JENNIFER MAARSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAARSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
AVP - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014