skip to content

Ma, Ling Ling

CPSO#: 94673

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012