skip to content

Ma, Lei

CPSO#: 97941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Vincent Hospital
60 Cambridge St. N
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 2215 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perley and Rideau Veterans' Health
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Canada
Phone: 613-526-7170
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lei Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ma ( CPSO# 97941 )

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEI MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015