skip to content

Ma, Karen Minyun

CPSO#: 97760

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Li, Karen Minyun (used until: 25 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Canada
Phone: 905-707-8181
Fax: 905-707-8180
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ma ( CPSO# 97760 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Business Address:
Suite 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Phone Number: (905) 707-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN MINYUN MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014