skip to content

Ma, Grace Chi Ming

CPSO#: 93931

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Palliative Care H336
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 7255
Fax: 4164805146 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doctors Ma and Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ma ( CPSO# 93931 )
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 94201 )

Business Address:
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE CHI MING MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011