skip to content

Ma, Grace Benedette Wai

CPSO#: 90555

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. W. Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ma ( CPSO# 90555 )

Business Address:
308 - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 586-0060

Business Address:
888 Regent Street
Unit 204
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C6
Phone Number: (705) 586 - 00

Business Address:
888 Regent Street
Unit 204
Sudbury ON  P3E C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE BENEDETTE WAI MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 May 2017
CF - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)