skip to content

Ma, Elaine Frances

CPSO#: 97736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Doctors
Unit 7
730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone: (613) 384-7640
Fax: (613) 634-8595 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

102 Road 95
Wolfe Island ON  K0H2Y0
Canada
Phone: 613-384-7640
Fax: 613-634-8595
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Ma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ma ( CPSO# 97736 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
102 Road 95
Wolfe Island ON  K0H 2Y0
Phone Number: (613) 384-8709

Business Address:
7 - 730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone Number: (613) 384-8709

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELAINE FRANCES MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014