skip to content

M'Seffar, Abdelmajid

CPSO#: 27166

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Universite Mohammed V, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008