skip to content

Zubairi, Mohammad Samad Yaseen

CPSO#: 90661

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 73504 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Khan and M. Zubairi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zubairi ( CPSO# 90661 )
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 91455 )

Business Address:
MCMaster Children's Hospital
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SAMAD YASEEN ZUBAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUBAIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013