skip to content

Wong, Min Min Chi

CPSO#: 52040

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 716
Toronto ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 740-9663
Fax: (416) 740-0827 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: AK Sue Chue Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sue Chue Lam ( CPSO# 31519 )
Dr. M. Wong ( CPSO# 52040 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Pathology Department
1339 - 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIN MIN CHI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.