skip to content

White, Melinda Ann

CPSO#: 95733

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ardelt Medical Clinic
155 Ardelt Ave
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone: 519-741-1717
Fax: 226-475-0114 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Canada
Phone: 905-873-3000
Fax: 905-873-0800
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Andrew St. Family Health Centre
16 Andrew St.
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Canada
Phone: 519-804-9234
Fax: 519-804-2604
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.A. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. White ( CPSO# 95733 )

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3000

Business Address:
155 Ardelt Ave.
Kitchener ON  N2C 2E1
Phone Number: (519) 741-1717

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELINDA ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013