skip to content

Voss, Maurice David

CPSO#: 74024

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Auckland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34054 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
St. Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAURICE DAVID VOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005