skip to content

Van Vliet, Meghan Christine

CPSO#: 89238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Penticton Regional Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
550 Carmi Ave
Penticton BC  V2A 3G6
Phone: 250 492 4000

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meghan Van Vliet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Vliet ( CPSO# 89238 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone Number: (519) 621-9180


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGHAN CHRISTINE VAN VLIET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN VLIET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013