skip to content

Tariq, Marium

CPSO#: 94347

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit #4, 1 Glenn Hawthorne Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5R0C2
Phone: 905-366-0505
Fax: 905-366-0506 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5380 Terry Fox Way #10
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Canada
Phone: 905 858-3030
Fax: 9058583031
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

145 Queenston st
St Catharines ON  L2R2Z7
Canada
Phone: 9056882558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

2275 Britannia Rd West, Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L5M 2G6
Canada
Phone: 9055672525
Fax: 9055675995
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marium Tariq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tariq ( CPSO# 94347 )

Business Address:
1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Unit 4
Mississauga ON  L5R 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 366-0505


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIUM TARIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARIQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 29 Aug 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011