skip to content

Sawchuk, Michael Alexander

CPSO#: 97657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone: 519-873-1710
Fax: 519-873-1711 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sawchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sawchuk ( CPSO# 97657 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER SAWCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.