skip to content

Rutherford, Michael Nevin

CPSO#: 67926

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematopathology
The Ottawa Hospital
3rd Floor, Rm. M3887b, Box #115
Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 79863
Fax: 613-739-6186 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Nevin Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )

Business Address:
Pathology Department, HRSRH
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NEVIN RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2000