skip to content

Roy, Marie Lessard

CPSO#: 32873

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marie L. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may write to Dr. Papdopoulos at One Medical Place, 302-20 Wynford Drive, Toronto, ON, M3C 1J4 Phone: 416-445-9673 Fax: 416-445-9388
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective:21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019