skip to content

Roach, Muriel Phyllis

CPSO#: 29903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muriel Roach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roach ( CPSO# 29903 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 19 Sep 2019 Active
             As from September 19, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Muriel Phyllis Roach, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Roach has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                       DR. MURIEL PHYLLIS ROACH
                                             ("Dr. Roach")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; 
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Roach, certificate of registration number 29903, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            (3)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking with the
                  College dated May 24, 2019 (the "May 2019 Undertaking").  Once signed,
                  this Undertaking replaces the May 2019 Undertaking and the May 2019
                  Undertaking is no longer in effect.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective
                  immediately. 
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake that I will not practise medicine, with the
                  exception of practicing  as a surgical or operating room assistant, in
                  any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and 
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine with the
                        exception of practicing as a surgical or operating room assistant. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that upon my return to the practice of medicine
                  with the exception of practicing as a surgical or operating room
                  assistant, at minimum, the QAC will consider the results of my 2018 Peer
                  Review and will direct whether based upon my desired area or practice,
                  any specific remediation will be required. 

            C.    COMPLIANCE AND MONITORING

            (7)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any
                  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with
                  which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                  Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing
                  this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (8)   I, Dr. Roach, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                  provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            (9)   I, Dr. Roach, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            D.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (10)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practise with the exception of practicing as a surgical or operating room
                  assistant, the College may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, conditions or limitations
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to the Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  every Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roach, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Roach has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                        jurisdictions with the exception of practicing as a surgical or
                        operating room assistant. 
                  
            E.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Roach, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff 
                  with any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                  this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Roach, give my irrevocable consent to Chief of Staff to disclose
                  to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to this
                  Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance
                  with this Undertaking

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Muriel Phyllis Roach to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 19, 2019:

Dr. Roach has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions with the exception of practicing as a surgical or operating room assistant.