skip to content

Ranganathan, Meenatchi

CPSO#: 89447

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Vinayaka Mission's Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 King street West, Lower level
Dundas
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: 905-628-0054
Fax: 905-628-5701 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

3N10 CAAP
McMaster Children's hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 73687
Fax: 905-522-7982
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Ranganathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ranganathan ( CPSO# 89447 )

Business Address:
Lower-107 King St W
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: 9056280054

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3N10
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEENATCHI RANGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013