skip to content

Ngae, Min Yi

CPSO#: 94283

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Suite 1 179
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 6754779
Fax: (705) 675-4780 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Min Yi Ngae Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology and Lab Med
Suite 1 179
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIN YI NGAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGAE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.