skip to content

Mitar, Michael Domin

CPSO#: 98141

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
15 Mountain Ave S.
Stoney Creek ON  L8R 2V6
Phone: (905) 662-7555
Fax: (888) 528-6966 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 201
180 Vine St. S
St Catharines ON  L8R 2A9
Canada
Phone: 1-855-210-0757
Fax: 855-210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Mitar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mitar ( CPSO# 98141 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L8R 2A9

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
15 Mountain Avenue South
Suite 201
Hamilton ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 639-3209

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DOMIN MITAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016