skip to content

Mikhail, Mary Youssef Daoud

CPSO#: 99580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alpha care clinic
4473 innes road
Orléans ON  K4A 3J7
Phone: (613) 424-4103
Fax: 6134242830 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Atef Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghali ( CPSO# 91309 )
Dr. M. Mikhail ( CPSO# 99580 )

Business Address:
4473 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 424-4103

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY YOUSSEF DAOUD MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013