skip to content

MacDonald, Matthew Hillier

CPSO#: 93684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
Room D
675 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 1M9
Phone: (416) 716-9159 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew H. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Macdonald ( CPSO# 93684 )

Business Address:
675 King Street West
Suite 310 Room D
Toronto ON  M5V 1M9
Phone Number: (416) 716-9159

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW HILLIER MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012