skip to content

Lavigne, Marnie Lynn

CPSO#: 92846

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Smith, Marnie Lynn (used until: 15 Jul 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strive Sport & Exercise Medicine
Unit C
41 Commerce Park Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 8X1
Phone: 705-792-4278
Fax: 705-503-4277 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian College Student Life Ctr
Room J106A
1 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9
Canada
Phone: 705-792-4278
Fax: 705-503-4277
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lavigne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92818 )
Dr. M. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92846 )

Business Address:
1 Georgian Drive
Room J106A
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9
Phone Number: (705) 792-4278

Business Address:
Unit 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Business Address:
Strive Sport & Exercise Medicine
Unit C
41 Commerce Park Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 8X1
Phone Number: (705) 792-4278

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARNIE LYNN LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013