skip to content

Jugenburg, Martin

CPSO#: 86140

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone: (416) 834-6640
Fax: (647) 436-6969 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (647) 436-6969
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Jugenburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jugenburg ( CPSO# 86140 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Toronto Cosmetic Surgery Institute
The Fairmont Royal York Hotel
100 Front Street West
Level B
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 834-6640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Feb 2019

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Jugenburg’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Jugenburg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by advertising in a manner inconsistent with Ontario Regulation 114/94, made under the Medicine Act; permitting filming by a television crew during a surgical procedure without the patient’s consent and making improper use of images of her relating to her procedure; and by his use of video recording devices and/or video surveillance recording devices at his practice location. It is also alleged that Dr. Jugenburg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of Patient A, by posting pre and post-operative images of her on his social media accounts without her consent; pressuring her to follow and contribute to his social media accounts; touching her in an inappropriate manner without her consent; making inappropriate comments to her; and being dismissive of her concerns.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): June 17 - 19, 2020; June 24 - 26, 2020


Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Jugenburg’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Jugenburg engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, including by posting images of the patient on his website without the patient’s consent.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): January 13 - 15, 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 28 Feb 2019 Active
             As from February 28, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Martin Jugenburg, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Jugenburg to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MARTIN JUGENBURG
                                          ("Dr. Jugenburg")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Resolution Committee
                  of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, certificate of registration number 86140, am a member
                  of the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my use of security cameras and video surveillance recording
                  devices in my practice and that the College is conducting an
                  investigation, bearing File Number 1105076, into the information.

            (4)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel
                  of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, undertake that:  

                        (i)   As soon as any security cameras or video surveillance
                              recording devices are operational in my practices, I will
                              post a sign in the entrance way(s) and waiting room(s) in
                              each and every location where I practice, in a clearly
                              visible and secure location, in any languages in which I
                              provide services, notifying patients that the premises are
                              monitored by video surveillance; and 
                  
                        (ii)  Effective immediately, I will ensure that in each and every
                              location where I practise, there are no security cameras or
                              video surveillance recording devices in any areas where
                              patient encounters occur or may occur, which involve or may
                              involve patients moving or removing clothing.  These areas
                              include but are not limited to all examination rooms,
                              consultation rooms, operating rooms, etc.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (14)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jugenburg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College has received information regarding Dr.
                              Jugenburg's use of security cameras and video surveillance
                              recording devices in his practice and is conducting an
                              investigation into the information. During the investigation
                              and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee,
                              Dr. Jugenburg has undertaken to:
                  
                              (i)   As soon as any security cameras or video surveillance
                                    recording devices are operational in his practices, he
                                    will post a sign in the entrance way(s) and waiting
                                    room(s) in each and every location where he practises,
                                    in a clearly visible and secure location, in any
                                    languages in which he provides services, notifying
                                    patients that the premises are monitored by video
                                    surveillance; and
                  
                              (ii)  Effective immediately, he will ensure that in each and
                                    every location where he practises, there are no
                                    security cameras or video surveillance recording
                                    devices in any areas where patient encounters occur or
                                    may occur, which involve or may involve patients moving
                                    or removing clothing.  These areas include but are not
                                    limited to all examination rooms, consultation rooms,
                                    operating rooms, etc.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Jugenburg, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 28, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Martin Jugenburg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2019:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Jugenburg’s use of security cameras and video surveillance recording devices in his practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee, Dr. Jugenburg has undertaken to:

(i) As soon as any security cameras or video surveillance recording devices are operational in his practices, he will post a sign in the entrance way(s) and waiting room(s) in each and every location where he practises, in a clearly visible and secure location, in any languages in which he provides services, notifying patients that the premises are monitored by video surveillance; and

(ii) Effective immediately, he will ensure that in each and every location where he practises, there are no security cameras or video surveillance recording devices in any areas where patient encounters occur or may occur, which involve or may involve patients moving or removing clothing. These areas include but are not limited to all examination rooms, consultation rooms, operating rooms, etc.