skip to content

Ismail, Mohamed Abdel Hadi Elmorsi

CPSO#: 95203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ismail ( CPSO# 95203 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 1, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 1, 2019, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.2(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on June 27, 2019, Dr. Ismail withdrew his application for reappointment to WRH’s Professional Staff for the 2019/2020 credentialing year and resigned his privileges at WRH effective July 1, 2019.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 2, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 8, 2019, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.2(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective November 2, 2018, Dr. Mohamed Ismail voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH, and that effective November 16, 2018, Dr. Ismail agreed to take a leave of absence from WRH during which he would not exercise his privileges at WRH and not provide anesthesia services at any other hospital or facility.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDEL HADI ELMORSI ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.