skip to content

Islam, Md Ashiqul

CPSO#: 92111

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 28 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 May 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ashiqul Islam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Islam ( CPSO# 92111 )

Business Address:
222 King Street East
Suite 108
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-9770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 27 May 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 May 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 28 May 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 28 May 2020 Active