skip to content

Guindon, Melissa Marie Louise

CPSO#: 96227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1811 boul st Joseph
Orléans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melissa Guindon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Guindon ( CPSO# 96227 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1811 St Joseph
Orleans ON  K1C 7C6
Phone Number: (613) 590-0533

Business Address:
2305 Page
Orleans ON  K1W 1H3
Phone Number: (613) 804-2273

Business Address:
110 Rossignol
Orleans ON  K4A 0N2
Phone Number: (613) 451-1414


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARIE LOUISE GUINDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUINDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.