skip to content

Grzyb, Magdalena Julia

CPSO#: 93206

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Magdalena Grzyb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grzyb ( CPSO# 93206 )

Business Address:
5500 North Service Rd
#106
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone Number: 4388286483

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA JULIA GRZYB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRZYB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
EL - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017